Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2566 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2566 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2461 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3727 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#875 | Journal Page: 3727 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3727 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3727 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3709 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3709 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Filed |