E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4289
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5242
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1391
|
Journal Page: 5242
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5242
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5135
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3519
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3519
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
CA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 3519
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2613
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3727
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3727
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3727
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3709
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3709
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|