House | 05/05/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1119 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1119 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Filed |