House | 05/15/2009 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 3710 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Filed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1231 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#161 | Journal Page: 1230 |
House | 04/15/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1230 |