House | 05/24/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 4819 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 4327 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB2531 | Journal Page: 4327 |
House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3175 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Filed |