E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4986 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6027 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6903 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5202 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3365 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3365 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3365 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3365 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3365 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3365 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 3365 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2756 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2566 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2566 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#875 | Journal Page: 3728 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3728 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3728 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3711 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3711 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3301 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1919 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1863 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1863 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Filed |