Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1303 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1623 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Record vote | RV#216 | Journal Page: 1622 |
House | 04/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1622 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1622 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Amended | 6-Lucio | Journal Page: 1587 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | RV#195 | Journal Page: 1586 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Amendment adopted as amended | 3-Berman | Journal Page: 1586 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Amendment amended | 4-Berman | Journal Page: 1586 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 3-Berman | Journal Page: 1586 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1586 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Postponed | Journal Page: 1580 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | 2-Berman | Journal Page: 1580 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Rule 8, Section 3 and Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 1580 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 319 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 319 | |
House | 01/05/2009 | Filed |