Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB482 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R1775 KFF-D
 By: Rodriguez H.B. No. 482


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to programs to increase the availability of fresh produce
 to, and the purchase and consumption of fresh produce by, certain
 low-income individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Title 2, Agriculture Code, is amended by adding
 Chapters 23 and 24 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 23.  SMALL RETAILERS COMPETITIVE GRANT PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 23.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1) "Fresh produce" means fresh fruits and vegetables.
 (2)  "Program" means the small retailers competitive
 grant pilot program established under this chapter.
 Sec. 23.002.  ESTABLISHMENT OF SMALL RETAILERS COMPETITIVE
 GRANT PILOT PROGRAM. (a)  The department shall develop and
 implement a small retailers competitive grant pilot program through
 which the department will award grants to small retailers in
 certain low-income communities in this state to increase the access
 to fresh produce by individuals in those communities.
 (b)  The department by rule shall define "small retailer" for
 purposes of this chapter.
 (c)  The department shall select at least two urban and at
 least two rural counties in which to operate the program.  To be
 selected, a county must:
 (1)  have at least 75,000 residents who have net family
 incomes below 100 percent of the federal poverty level; or
 (2) have a poverty rate above the statewide average.
 Sec. 23.003.  ADVERTISEMENT. Before issuing a request for
 proposals or awarding a grant under this chapter, the department
 shall advertise the program by:
 (1)  posting information about the program on the
 department's Internet website; and
 (2)  as the department determines appropriate,
 distributing information about the program to food retailer
 associations, fresh produce associations, chambers of commerce,
 and other membership organizations with members that are small
 retailers.
 Sec. 23.004.  ELIGIBILITY. A small retailer is eligible to
 apply for a grant under the program if:
 (1)  the small retailer's place of business is located
 within a county in which the department operates the program; and
 (2)  there is no other retailer of fresh produce within
 a one-mile radius of the small retailer's place of business on the
 date of the application.
 Sec. 23.005.  USE OF AWARDED GRANT MONEY. A grant recipient
 may use grant money awarded under the program only to cover costs
 that are approved by the department, which may include costs
 related to:
 (1)  training employees regarding the proper storage of
 fresh produce;
 (2)  training employees regarding the marketing of
 fresh produce;
 (3)  obtaining marketing materials, including signage
 and flyers;
 (4)  obtaining refrigeration units for the storage of
 fresh produce; and
 (5)  obtaining technical assistance regarding
 refrigeration units and other equipment required to store fresh
 produce.
 Sec. 23.006.  GRANT RECIPIENT REPORTING REQUIREMENTS.  A
 grant recipient shall report information related to the program to
 the department in the form and manner and at regular intervals as
 prescribed by the department. Each report must include the
 following information for the period covered by the report:
 (1)  the amount of fresh produce that was added to the
 recipient's inventory as a result of the grant;
 (2)  the amount of monthly gross receipts earned from
 the sale of fresh produce; and
 (3)  a detailed accounting of how the grant money was
 spent.
 Sec. 23.007.  EVALUATION BY DEPARTMENT.  The department
 shall monitor and periodically evaluate:
 (1)  the performance of each grant recipient under the
 program;
 (2)  how each grant recipient uses the grant money
 awarded under the program; and
 (3)  the effect of the program on the ability of the
 grant recipient to include fresh produce in the grant recipient's
 inventory.
 Sec. 23.008.  FUNDING.  The department shall seek and apply
 for any available federal funding, including federal matching
 funds, to assist with financing the program.
 Sec. 23.009.  REPORT TO LEGISLATURE. Not later than
 December 1, 2010, the department shall submit an initial report to
 the legislature that includes:
 (1)  an evaluation of the performance and operation of
 the program; and
 (2)  recommendations on the continuation, elimination,
 or expansion of the program.
 Sec. 23.010.  EXPIRATION. This chapter expires September 1,
 2011.
 CHAPTER 24. FARMERS' MARKET NUTRITION PROGRAM FOR SENIORS
 Sec. 24.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "program" means
 the farmers' market nutrition program for seniors established under
 this chapter.
 Sec. 24.002.  ESTABLISHMENT OF FARMERS' MARKET NUTRITION
 PROGRAM FOR SENIORS. Subject to available federal funding, the
 department shall establish and implement a farmers' market
 nutrition program for seniors in accordance with 7 U.S.C. Section
 3007 to provide low-income persons who are 60 years of age or older
 with fresh fruits, vegetables, and herbs through farmers' markets
 and other local venues.
 Sec. 24.003.  FUNDING. The department shall seek and apply
 for any available federal funding to finance the program.
 Sec. 24.004.  RULES. The department shall adopt rules
 necessary to implement the program.
 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2010, the Department of
 Agriculture shall implement the small retailers competitive grant
 pilot program established under Chapter 23, Agriculture Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the completion of
 the small retailers competitive grant pilot program implemented
 under Chapter 23, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act, but not
 later than November 1, 2011, the Department of Agriculture shall
 submit a final report to the legislature that includes an overall
 evaluation of the performance and operation of the program.
 SECTION 4. As soon as practicable, the Department of
 Agriculture shall apply for and actively pursue federal funding to
 implement the farmers' market nutrition program for seniors
 established under Chapter 24, Agriculture Code, as added by this
 Act. The department shall delay implementing the program until the
 federal funding applied for under this section is granted.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.