Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3758 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#898 | Journal Page: 3757 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3757 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3757 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3595 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3595 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 1-Pickett | Journal Page: 3594 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3594 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 319 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 319 | |
House | 01/06/2009 | Filed |