House
|
05/11/2009
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 1832
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/11/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/4/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2201
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2201
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/30/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1737
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1737
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/23/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 319
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 319
|
House
|
01/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|