1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 498 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the establishment of an advisory panel to assist with a |
---|
6 | 6 | | study regarding the prevention of wrongful convictions. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. (a) The Timothy Cole advisory panel on wrongful |
---|
9 | 9 | | convictions is established to assist the Task Force on Indigent |
---|
10 | 10 | | Defense established under Subchapter D, Chapter 71, Government |
---|
11 | 11 | | Code, in conducting a study and preparing a report regarding the |
---|
12 | 12 | | prevention of wrongful convictions as provided by this section. |
---|
13 | 13 | | (b) The advisory panel is composed of the following members: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) the director of the Task Force on Indigent |
---|
15 | 15 | | Defense; |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) the chair of the criminal justice committee of the |
---|
17 | 17 | | senate or a member of the senate designated by the chair; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) the chair of the jurisprudence committee of the |
---|
19 | 19 | | senate or a member of the senate designated by the chair; |
---|
20 | 20 | | (4) the chair of the criminal jurisprudence committee |
---|
21 | 21 | | of the house of representatives or a member of the house of |
---|
22 | 22 | | representatives designated by the chair; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (5) the chair of the corrections committee of the |
---|
24 | 24 | | house of representatives or a member of the house of |
---|
25 | 25 | | representatives designated by the chair; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (6) the executive director of the Texas Criminal |
---|
27 | 27 | | Defense Lawyers Association or a representative designated by the |
---|
28 | 28 | | executive director; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (7) the president of the Texas District and County |
---|
30 | 30 | | Attorneys Association or a representative designated by the |
---|
31 | 31 | | president; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (8) the presiding judge of the court of criminal |
---|
33 | 33 | | appeals or a representative who is designated by the presiding |
---|
34 | 34 | | judge and who is a judge of the court of criminal appeals; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (9) one representative of a public law school in this |
---|
36 | 36 | | state, chosen by the deans of the public law schools in this state; |
---|
37 | 37 | | and |
---|
38 | 38 | | (10) one employee of the office of the governor, |
---|
39 | 39 | | appointed by the governor. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (c) The director of the Task Force on Indigent Defense is |
---|
41 | 41 | | the presiding officer of the advisory panel. The advisory panel |
---|
42 | 42 | | shall meet at the call of the presiding officer but not less than |
---|
43 | 43 | | three times in person and as needed by telephone conference call. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (d) The Task Force on Indigent Defense, with the advice and |
---|
45 | 45 | | assistance of the advisory panel, shall conduct a study regarding: |
---|
46 | 46 | | (1) the causes of wrongful convictions; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (2) procedures and programs that may be implemented to |
---|
48 | 48 | | prevent future wrongful convictions; |
---|
49 | 49 | | (3) the effects of state law on wrongful convictions, |
---|
50 | 50 | | as determined based on state statutes regarding eyewitness |
---|
51 | 51 | | identification procedures, the recording of custodial |
---|
52 | 52 | | interrogations, postconviction DNA testing, and writs of habeas |
---|
53 | 53 | | corpus based on relevant scientific evidence; and |
---|
54 | 54 | | (4) whether the creation of an innocence commission to |
---|
55 | 55 | | investigate wrongful convictions would be appropriate. |
---|
56 | 56 | | (e) The Task Force on Indigent Defense may request that an |
---|
57 | 57 | | entity in the legislative, judicial, or executive branch of state |
---|
58 | 58 | | government or a political subdivision provide to the advisory panel |
---|
59 | 59 | | information related to the advisory panel's duties under this |
---|
60 | 60 | | section. On the request of the Task Force on Indigent Defense under |
---|
61 | 61 | | this subsection, an entity may provide information to the advisory |
---|
62 | 62 | | panel unless the entity is otherwise prohibited from disclosing the |
---|
63 | 63 | | information. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (f) Not later than January 1, 2011, the Task Force on |
---|
65 | 65 | | Indigent Defense shall prepare a report regarding the results of |
---|
66 | 66 | | the study conducted under this section and submit the report, after |
---|
67 | 67 | | consulting with the advisory panel, to the governor, the lieutenant |
---|
68 | 68 | | governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the |
---|
69 | 69 | | standing committees of each house of the legislature with a |
---|
70 | 70 | | representative serving on the advisory panel. |
---|
71 | 71 | | (g) This section expires January 1, 2011. |
---|
72 | 72 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
73 | 73 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
74 | 74 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
75 | 75 | | I certify that H.B. No. 498 was passed by the House on May 15, |
---|
76 | 76 | | 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 87, Nays 51, 2 present, not |
---|
77 | 77 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
78 | 78 | | H.B. No. 498 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
79 | 79 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
80 | 80 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
81 | 81 | | on H.B. No. 498 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 89, |
---|
82 | 82 | | Nays 56, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
83 | 83 | | ______________________________ |
---|
84 | 84 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
85 | 85 | | I certify that H.B. No. 498 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
86 | 86 | | amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays |
---|
87 | 87 | | 3; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
88 | 88 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
89 | 89 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
90 | 90 | | 498 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4. |
---|
91 | 91 | | ______________________________ |
---|
92 | 92 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
93 | 93 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
94 | 94 | | Date |
---|
95 | 95 | | __________________ |
---|
96 | 96 | | Governor |
---|