House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1771 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1122 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1122 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 320 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 320 | |
House | 01/08/2009 | Filed |