E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5197
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5114
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#313
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1813
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1813
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
House
|
01/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|