E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 1/1/10
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/31/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5976
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5124
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3498
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3498
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
House
|
05/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3760
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#900
|
Journal Page: 3759
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3759
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3759
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3599
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
House
|
01/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|