E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6902
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5023
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6112
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6109
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4805
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4590
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4590
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5849
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5849
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5849
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5210
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#698
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3003
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3003
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Bolton
|
Journal Page: 3003
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3002
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/8/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2762
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2762
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
House
|
01/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|