E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4519
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5707
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1483
|
Journal Page: 5708
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5707
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5198
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Carona
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3292
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3292
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
House
|
05/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3953
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3754
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#893
|
Journal Page: 3754
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3754
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3754
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3528
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3528
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Branch
|
Journal Page: 3528
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/14/09 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3423
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3423
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 272
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 272
|
House
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|