House | 05/12/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3205 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB820 | Journal Page: 3205 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 323 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 323 | |
House | 01/12/2009 | Filed |