Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#620
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2682
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2682
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2336
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 324
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 324
|
House
|
01/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|