House
|
04/22/2009
|
Returned to Calendars Committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1217
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 324
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 324
|
House
|
01/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|