H.B. No. 583 AN ACT relating to expansion of the electronic eligibility information pilot project operated by the Health and Human Services Commission. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 531.02413, Government Code, as added by Chapter 605 (H.B. 321), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 531.02413. ELECTRONIC ELIGIBILITY INFORMATION PILOT PROJECT. (a) The commission shall establish a pilot project in at least one urban area of this state to determine the feasibility, costs, and benefits of accepting, for the purpose of establishing eligibility for benefits under state and federal health and human services programs administered by the commission, the direct importation of electronic eligibility information from an electronic system operated by a regional safety net provider [indigent care] collaborative organization [system]. (a-1) Not later than September 1, 2010, the commission shall expand the pilot project to at least one additional urban area of this state if the commission has implemented the Texas Integrated Eligibility Redesign System (TIERS) in the area selected for the expansion. (b) An area selected for the pilot project under this section must possess a functioning safety net provider [indigent care] collaborative organization [system] that includes a network of providers and assesses eligibility for health and human services programs using electronic systems. The electronic systems used by the collaborative organization [system] must be able to interface with electronic systems managed by the commission to enable the commission to import application and eligibility information regarding applicants for health and human services programs. (c) In establishing a pilot project under this section, the commission shall: (1) create [focus on creating] a project in which [electronic applications for indigent care created by a] regional indigent care networks interface with the commission through the Texas Integrated Eligibility Redesign System (TIERS) or another state electronic eligibility system, as appropriate, to share electronic applications for indigent care created by the care network [may be shared] with the commission to facilitate enrollment in health and human services programs administered by the commission; (2) automatically import the application information submitted under Subdivision (1) with minimal human intervention to eliminate double data entry and data entry errors and to ensure most appropriate use of commission resources while maintaining program integrity; (3) [(2)] solicit and obtain support for the project from local officials and indigent care providers; (4) [(3)] ensure that all identifying and descriptive information of recipients in each health and human services program included in the project can only be accessed by providers or other entities participating in the project; and (5) [(4)] ensure that the storage and communication of all identifying and descriptive information included in the project complies with existing federal and state privacy laws governing individually identifiable information for recipients of public benefits programs. (d) In implementing the project under Subsection (c), the commission shall review and process applications in a timely manner and, to the extent allowed by federal law and regulations, work directly with each organization to obtain missing documents and resolve issues that impede enrollment. Each organization must be authorized by the applicant to receive information concerning the applicant directly from the commission. (e) The commission shall provide a monthly statistical report to each safety net provider collaborative organization that submits an application under Subsection (d) and to the Legislative Budget Board on the number of applications processed, the timeliness of the application process, and the reasons for any delays. The commission shall work with the safety net provider collaborative organizations to decrease delays in processing applications. SECTION 2. Not later than December 15, 2011, the Health and Human Services Commission shall: (1) assess the cost-effectiveness, efficacy, efficiency, and benefits of using electronic eligibility information imported from electronic systems operated by regional safety net provider collaborative organizations; and (2) report the commission's findings resulting from the pilot project established under Section 531.02413, Government Code, as added by Chapter 605 (H.B. 321), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, and amended by this Act, to the standing committees of the senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over health and human services issues. SECTION 3. If before implementing any provision of this Act a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the waiver or authorization is granted. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 583 was passed by the House on May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 583 was passed by the Senate on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor