House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/20/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 565 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 565 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |