Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2730
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2508
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#319
|
Journal Page: 1854
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1854
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1854
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 272
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 272
|
House
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|