House | 05/07/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2718 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 562 | Journal Page: 2718 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Postponed | 5/7/09 7:03 AM | Journal Page: 2609 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2609 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Postponed | 5/6/09 8:03 AM | Journal Page: 2393 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2393 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Postponed | 5/4/09 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2115 |
House | 04/29/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2115 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 329 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 329 | |
House | 01/15/2009 | Filed |