Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3767 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#905 | Journal Page: 3766 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3766 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3766 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3640 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3640 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 2-Menendez | Journal Page: 3640 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3640 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1034 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 329 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 329 | |
House | 01/15/2009 | Filed |