Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB666 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 666


 AN ACT
 relating to certain costs used to fund drug court programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 102.0178(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) In addition to other costs on conviction imposed by this
 chapter, a person shall pay $60 [$50] as a court cost on conviction
 of an offense punishable as a Class B misdemeanor or any higher
 category of offense under:
 (1) Chapter 49, Penal Code; or
 (2) Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2. (a) Section 102.021, Government Code, is
 amended to conform to Chapter 1263 (H.B. 3060), Acts of the 80th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, and is further amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 102.021. COURT COSTS ON CONVICTION: CODE OF CRIMINAL
 PROCEDURE. A person convicted of an offense shall pay the following
 under the Code of Criminal Procedure, in addition to all other
 costs:
 (1) court cost on conviction of any offense, other
 than a conviction of an offense relating to a pedestrian or the
 parking of a motor vehicle (Art. 102.0045, Code of Criminal
 Procedure) . . . $4;
 (2) a fee for services of prosecutor (Art. 102.008,
 Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $25;
 (3) fees for services of peace officer:
 (A) issuing a written notice to appear in court
 for certain violations (Art. 102.011, Code of Criminal Procedure)
 . . . $5;
 (B) executing or processing an issued arrest
 warrant, [or] capias, or capias pro fine (Art. 102.011, Code of
 Criminal Procedure) . . . $50;
 (C) summoning a witness (Art. 102.011, Code of
 Criminal Procedure) . . . $5;
 (D) serving a writ not otherwise listed (Art.
 102.011, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $35;
 (E) taking and approving a bond and, if
 necessary, returning the bond to courthouse (Art. 102.011, Code of
 Criminal Procedure) . . . $10;
 (F) commitment or release (Art. 102.011, Code of
 Criminal Procedure) . . . $5;
 (G) summoning a jury (Art. 102.011, Code of
 Criminal Procedure) . . . $5;
 (H) attendance of a prisoner in habeas corpus
 case if prisoner has been remanded to custody or held to bail (Art.
 102.011, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $8 each day;
 (I) mileage for certain services performed (Art.
 102.011, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $0.29 per mile; and
 (J) services of a sheriff or constable who serves
 process and attends examining trial in certain cases (Art. 102.011,
 Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . not to exceed $5;
 (4) services of a peace officer in conveying a witness
 outside the county (Art. 102.011, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . .
 $10 per day or part of a day, plus actual necessary travel expenses;
 (5) overtime of peace officer for time spent
 testifying in the trial or traveling to or from testifying in the
 trial (Art. 102.011, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . actual cost;
 (6) court costs on an offense relating to rules of the
 road, when offense occurs within a school crossing zone (Art.
 102.014, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $25;
 (7) court costs on an offense of passing a school bus
 (Art. 102.014, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $25;
 (8) court costs on an offense of truancy or
 contributing to truancy (Art. 102.014, Code of Criminal Procedure)
 . . . $20;
 (9) cost for visual recording of intoxication arrest
 before conviction (Art. 102.018, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . .
 $15;
 (10) cost of certain evaluations (Art. 102.018, Code
 of Criminal Procedure) . . . actual cost;
 (11) additional costs attendant to certain
 intoxication convictions under Chapter 49, Penal Code, for
 emergency medical services, trauma facilities, and trauma care
 systems (Art. 102.0185, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $100;
 (12) additional costs attendant to certain child
 sexual assault and related convictions, for child abuse prevention
 programs (Art. 102.0186, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $100;
 (13) cost for DNA testing for certain felonies (Art.
 102.020, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $250;
 (14) court cost on an offense of public lewdness or
 indecent exposure (Art. 102.020, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . .
 $50;
 (15) if required by the court, a restitution fee for
 costs incurred in collecting restitution installments and for the
 compensation to victims of crime fund (Art. 42.037, Code of
 Criminal Procedure) . . . $12; [and]
 (16) if directed by the justice of the peace or
 municipal court judge hearing the case, court costs on conviction
 in a criminal action (Art. 45.041, Code of Criminal Procedure)
 . . . part or all of the costs as directed by the judge; and
 (17)  costs attendant to convictions under Chapter 49,
 Penal Code, and under Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code, to help
 fund drug court programs established under Chapter 469, Health and
 Safety Code (Art. 102.0178, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $60.
 (b) Section 102.0215, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense was committed before that
 date.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 666 was passed by the House on April
 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 666 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 666 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 666 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 666 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor