House | 05/01/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2223 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 187 | Journal Page: 2223 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Postponed | 5/1/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1999 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1999 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1123 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 513 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 513 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 273 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 273 | |
House | 11/10/2008 | Filed |