House | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 576 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 576 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Redistricting | Journal Page: 330 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 330 | |
House | 01/16/2009 | Filed |