E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6895
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4289
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5268
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5269
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1400
|
Journal Page: 5268
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5268
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5115
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
CA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3169
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#312
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1847
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1812
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1812
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 330
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 330
|
House
|
01/16/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|