E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 05/26/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2897 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4640 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4303 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 742 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Record vote | RV#68 | Journal Page: 940 |
House | 03/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 940 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 940 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 900 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 900 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 728 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 331 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 331 | |
House | 01/21/2009 | Filed |