Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB695 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R3776 TRH-D
 By: Anchia H.B. No. 695


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a loan incentive program to
 promote energy efficiency in apartment buildings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.002, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 39.002. APPLICABILITY. This chapter, other than
 Sections 39.155, 39.157(e), 39.203, 39.903, 39.904, 39.9051,
 39.9052, 39.9054, and 39.914(e), does not apply to a municipally
 owned utility or an electric cooperative. Sections 39.157(e),
 39.203, and 39.904, however, apply only to a municipally owned
 utility or an electric cooperative that is offering customer
 choice. If there is a conflict between the specific provisions of
 this chapter and any other provisions of this title, except for
 Chapters 40 and 41, the provisions of this chapter control.
 SECTION 2. Section 39.905(a), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) It is the goal of the legislature that:
 (1) electric utilities will administer energy
 efficiency incentive programs in a market-neutral,
 nondiscriminatory manner but will not offer underlying competitive
 services;
 (2) all customers, in all customer classes, will have
 a choice of and access to energy efficiency alternatives and other
 choices from the market that allow each customer to reduce energy
 consumption, peak demand, or energy costs;
 (3) each electric utility will provide, through
 market-based standard offer programs, low-interest energy
 efficiency improvement loan programs, or limited, targeted,
 market-transformation programs, incentives sufficient for retail
 electric providers and competitive energy service providers to
 acquire additional cost-effective energy efficiency for
 residential and commercial customers equivalent to at least:
 (A) 10 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2007;
 (B) 15 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2008, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2008 funding may not be greater than 75 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing; and
 (C) 20 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2009, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2009 funding may not be greater than 150 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing;
 (4) each electric utility in the ERCOT region shall
 use its best efforts to encourage and facilitate the involvement of
 the region's retail electric providers in the delivery of
 efficiency programs and demand response programs under this
 section;
 (5) retail electric providers in the ERCOT region, and
 electric utilities outside of the ERCOT region, shall provide
 customers with energy efficiency educational materials; and
 (6) notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), electric
 utilities shall continue to make available, at 2007 funding and
 participation levels, any load management standard offer programs
 developed for industrial customers and implemented prior to May 1,
 2007.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter Z, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.9054 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.9054.  ENERGY EFFICIENCY IMPROVEMENT LOAN PROGRAM
 FOR APARTMENT BUILDINGS. (a)  As a means of accomplishing the goals
 of Section 39.905, an electric utility may administer a
 low-interest loan program to promote energy efficiency
 improvements in apartment buildings. The commission shall adopt
 rules and procedures for the loan programs. Commission rules must:
 (1) establish the manner in which loans are repaid;
 (2)  establish an energy efficiency cost recovery
 factor for ensuring timely and reasonable recovery of other costs
 associated with loans made under this section to the extent the
 costs are not recovered through interest payments;
 (3)  provide a mechanism for a utility that is unable to
 establish an energy efficiency cost recovery factor in a timely
 manner because of a rate freeze to:
 (A)  defer the other costs of a loan program under
 this section; and
 (B)  recover those deferred costs through an
 energy efficiency cost recovery factor on the expiration of the
 rate freeze period;
 (4)  ensure that the other costs of loans provided
 under this section are borne by the customer classes that receive
 the benefits of loan proceeds; and
 (5)  encourage a utility to pass on the value of the
 incentives to the end-use customer.
 (b)  The energy efficiency cost recovery factor under
 Subsection (a) may not result in an over-recovery of costs but may
 be adjusted each year to change rates to enable electric utilities
 to match revenues against energy efficiency costs and any
 incentives to which they are granted. The commission shall adjust
 the factor to reflect any over-collection or under-collection of
 energy efficiency cost recovery revenues in previous years.
 (c)  To be eligible for a loan under a program, an applicant
 must:
 (1)  be an owner of an existing multi-unit apartment
 building; and
 (2)  use the loan for installation of an appliance or
 equipment designed to reduce demand for energy in the apartment
 building or for a renovation or repair intended to reduce demand for
 energy in the apartment building.
 (d) The commission by rule shall specify:
 (1)  the types of appliances, equipment, renovations,
 and repairs for which a loan may be made under the program; and
 (2)  the types of apartment buildings for which a loan
 may be made under the program.
 (e)  The rules relating to repayment of loans must provide
 that each loan be repaid:
 (1) over a period determined by the commission:
 (A)  by a surcharge on the electricity bills of
 the rental units improved through loan proceeds, if the building's
 rental units are separately submetered and billed directly by a
 utility provider;
 (B)  by a surcharge on the electricity bill of the
 building's owner, if:
 (i) the building's rental units are not
 separately submetered or billed directly by a utility provider, and
 the improvements are made to a specific unit; or
 (ii)  the improvements are made to a common
 area of the building; or
 (C) by a combination of surcharges on the
 electricity bill of the building's owner and tenants of improved
 units;
 (2) according to a formula:
 (A)  based on the difference between total monthly
 energy costs after improvements are made and the estimated monthly
 energy costs if the improvements had not been made;
 (B)  that allocates loan repayment costs in a
 submetered apartment building, or an apartment building that uses
 central system utilities in which the building owner prorates
 utility costs among tenants, only to those rental units that are
 directly improved using loan proceeds;
 (C)  that allows the tenant of an improved unit in
 a separately submetered apartment building, or the tenant of an
 improved unit in an apartment building using central system
 utilities in which the building owner prorates utility costs among
 tenants, to realize at least 40 percent of the energy cost savings
 computed in Paragraph (A); and
 (D)  that allows the owner of an apartment
 building using central system utilities in which the owner does not
 prorate utility costs among tenants to realize at least 40 percent
 of the energy cost savings computed in Paragraph (A); and
 (3)  by periodic assessments against the recipient of
 the loan, determined according to the amount owed and the
 building's property tax valuation, if, before the loan is fully
 repaid, the building is sold, is no longer leased to tenants, or is
 destroyed.
 (f)  The loan repayment surcharge required by Subsection (e)
 may not be charged to a tenant or building owner after a loan has
 been repaid in full.
 (g)  The commission may establish the rate used to compute a
 loan repayment surcharge.
 SECTION 4. Not later than December 1, 2009, the Public
 Utility Commission of Texas shall establish the energy efficiency
 improvement loan program under Section 39.9054, Utilities Code, as
 added by this Act, and the commission shall begin accepting
 applications for loans under that program not later than January 1,
 2010.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.