E
|
05/23/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
E
|
05/15/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3207
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2230
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#104
|
Journal Page: 1059
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1059
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1059
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1056
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1054
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 462
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 462
|
House
|
01/21/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|