Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 3165 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3766 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#904 | Journal Page: 3765 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3765 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Amended | 1-Gonzales | Journal Page: 3765 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3764 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3638 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 2-Alonzo | Journal Page: 3638 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3636 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 347 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 347 | |
House | 01/21/2009 | Filed |