Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 911 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 911 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 825 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1034 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Record vote | RV#83 | Journal Page: 1007 |
House | 03/31/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Amended | 1-Chisum | Journal Page: 1006 |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1006 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 976 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 976 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 860 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 273 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 273 | |
House | 11/10/2008 | Filed |