House | 05/06/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2579 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Record vote | RV#588 | Journal Page: 2579 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 2579 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2578 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2514 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | RV#566 | Journal Page: 2513 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2513 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) | Journal Page: 2513 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2513 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Postponed | 5/5/09 5:00 PM | Journal Page: 2496 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) | Journal Page: 2496 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2495 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1092 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 347 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 347 | |
House | 01/21/2009 | Filed |