E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 05/31/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6976 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4680 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5976 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6039 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5125 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3499 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3499 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3499 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3499 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3499 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3499 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3499 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2725 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3777 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#915 | Journal Page: 3776 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3776 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3776 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3664 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3664 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 373 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 373 | |
House | 01/22/2009 | Filed |