E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4303
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#544
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2439
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Taylor
|
Journal Page: 2439
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2439
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2135
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 349
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 349
|
House
|
01/22/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|