House | 05/15/2009 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar on 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3723 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3686 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3686 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3175 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 350 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 350 | |
House | 01/22/2009 | Filed |