E | 05/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4221 | |
E | 05/08/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3176 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2146 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3039 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3176 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2687 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2099 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2099 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2099 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2099 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2099 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2099 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2099 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#223 | Journal Page: 1682 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1682 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1682 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1667 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1667 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 350 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 350 | |
House | 01/23/2009 | Filed |