Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1932 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1932 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 888 | |
House | 04/03/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1093 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Record vote | RV#105 | Journal Page: 1059 |
House | 04/02/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1059 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1059 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1057 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1056 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1055 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Amended | 1-Phillips | Journal Page: 1055 |
House | 04/02/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1055 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 351 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 351 | |
House | 01/23/2009 | Filed |