Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB764 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 764


 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for assignment as a visiting judge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 25.0022(t), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (t) To be eligible for assignment under this section, a
 former or retired judge of a statutory probate court must:
 (1) not have been removed from office; [and]
 (2) certify under oath to the presiding judge, on a
 form prescribed by the state board of regional judges, that:
 (A)  the judge has not been publicly reprimanded
 or censured by the State Commission on Judicial Conduct; and
 (B) the judge:
 (i) did not resign or retire from office
 after the State Commission on Judicial Conduct notified the judge
 of the commencement of a full investigation into an allegation or
 appearance of misconduct or disability of the judge [having
 received notice that formal proceedings by the State Commission on
 Judicial Conduct had been instituted] as provided in Section 33.022
 and before the final disposition of that investigation; or
 (ii)  if the judge did resign from office
 under circumstances described by Subparagraph (i), was not publicly
 reprimanded or censured as a result of the investigation;
 (3)  annually demonstrate that the judge has completed
 in the past state fiscal year the educational requirements for an
 active statutory probate court judge;
 (4)  have served as an active judge for at least 96
 months in a district, statutory probate, statutory county, or
 appellate court; and
 (5)  have developed substantial experience in the
 judge's area of specialty [the proceedings].
 SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by Chapter 315 (H.B.
 3306), Acts of the 78th Legislature, Regular Session, 2003, to
 Section 74.055(c)(1), Government Code, does not apply to a person
 who:
 (1) was serving a term as an active judge described by
 Section 74.054(a)(1), Government Code, on August 31, 2003; and
 (2) on completion of that term, met the eligibility
 requirements, other than the requirement of Section 74.055(c)(6),
 Government Code, to be named on a list of retired and former judges
 under Section 74.055(c), Government Code, as that law existed on
 August 31, 2003.
 (b) Section 74.055(c), Government Code, as it existed on
 August 31, 2003, is continued in effect for determining the
 eligibility of a person described by Subsection (a) of this section
 to be named on the list of retired and former judges subject to
 assignment.
 SECTION 3. (a) The change in law made by this Act by
 amending Section 25.0022(t)(2), Government Code, and by adding
 Sections 25.0022(t)(4) and (5), Government Code, applies only to an
 assignment of a visiting judge appointed under Chapter 25,
 Government Code, made on or after September 1, 2009. An assignment
 made before September 1, 2009, is governed by Section 25.0022(t),
 Government Code, as it exists on the date of the assignment, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b) The change in law made by this Act by amending Section
 25.0022(t)(2), Government Code, and by adding Sections
 25.0022(t)(4) and (5), Government Code, does not apply to a person
 who immediately before the effective date of this Act meets the
 eligibility requirements to be assigned by the presiding judge
 under Section 25.0022(h), Government Code, and the former law is
 continued in effect for determining that person's eligibility for
 that purpose.
 (c) The change in law made by this Act by adding Section
 25.0022(t)(3), Government Code, applies only to an assignment of a
 visiting judge appointed under Chapter 25, Government Code, made on
 or after September 1, 2010. Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, an assignment made before September 1, 2010, is
 governed by Section 25.0022(t), Government Code, as it exists on
 the date of the assignment, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 (d) Section 25.0022(t)(2)(A), Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a reprimand or censure issued by the State
 Commission on Judicial Conduct on or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 764 was passed by the House on April
 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 764 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 764 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 764 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 764 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor