Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#227
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Christian
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1625
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1625
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 273
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 273
|
House
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|