E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 1/1/10
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1676
|
Journal Page: 6555
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6549
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6902
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5020
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4941
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6028
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4556
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5924
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5924
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5924
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5204
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Jackson
|
Journal Page: 3631
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3630
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3630
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2717
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#648
|
Journal Page: 2716
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2716
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 2716
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2716
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/7/09 12:25 PM
|
Journal Page: 2709
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2709
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2657
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 2657
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hamilton
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 352
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 352
|
House
|
01/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|