E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6027
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5210
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 2561
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2561
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1480
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1480
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 825
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1034
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#79
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 975
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 352
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 352
|
House
|
01/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|