Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1949 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#492 | Journal Page: 2287 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2287 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2287 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2242 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2242 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 02/25/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 352 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 352 | |
House | 01/26/2009 | Filed |