E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2894
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4648
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1124
|
Journal Page: 4648
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4648
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4353
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2749
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2749
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2749
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2749
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Postponed
|
3:40 PM
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2633
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#233
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1034
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 353
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 353
|
House
|
01/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|