Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB783 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Pickett (Senate Sponsor - Shapleigh) H.B. No. 783
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 783 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the liability of an electric utility that allows
 recreational use of land that the utility owns, occupies, or
 leases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 75, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is
 amended by adding Section 75.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 75.0021.  LIMITED LIABILITY OF CERTAIN PUBLIC
 UTILITIES. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Person" includes an individual as defined by
 Section 71.001.
 (2)  "Public utility" means an electric utility as
 defined by Section 31.002, Utilities Code.
 (b)  A public utility that, as the owner, easement holder,
 occupant, or lessee of land, signs an agreement with a
 municipality, county, or political subdivision to allow public
 access to or use of the premises for recreation by allowing the
 public access or use does not assume responsibility or incur
 liability beyond that provided by Chapter 75 of the Civil Practice &
 Remedies Code to a third party who enters the premises for
 recreation to the extent the municipality, county, or political
 subdivision purchases a general liability insurance policy in
 amounts required by Chapter 75 of the Civil Practice & Remedies Code
 insuring the public utility for liability arising from the
 condition of the premises for such recreational use.
 (c)  This section applies only to a public utility located in
 a county with a population of 600,000 or more and located on the
 international border.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies only to a cause of action that
 accrues on or after the effective date of this Act. A cause of
 action that accrues before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect immediately before that date, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *