Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3776 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#914 | Journal Page: 3775 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3775 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3775 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3664 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | 5-Bonnen | Journal Page: 3664 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Journal Page: 3664 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 4-Menendez | Journal Page: 3664 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment as amended withdrawn | 1-Dunnam | Journal Page: 3664 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment amended | 3-Gonzales | Journal Page: 3663 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3663 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 354 | |
House | 01/26/2009 | Filed |