E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4408
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4409
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1076
|
Journal Page: 4408
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4408
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1949
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#475
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Amended
|
1-J. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 373
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 373
|
House
|
01/27/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|