H.B. No. 802 AN ACT relating to the creation of the lifespan respite services program. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 161, Human Resources Code, is amended by adding Subchapter F to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER F. LIFESPAN RESPITE SERVICES PROGRAM Sec. 161.151. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: (1) "Chronic serious health condition" means a health condition that: (A) requires periodic treatment by a health care provider, including a nurse as authorized by Chapter 301, Occupations Code, or a physician assistant as authorized by Chapter 204, Occupations Code; and (B) continues over an extended period, including recurring episodes of a single underlying health condition such as asthma, diabetes, epilepsy, or multiple sclerosis. (2) "Respite services" means support services, including in-home services or adult day-care services, that are provided for the purpose of temporarily giving relief to a primary caregiver who provides care to an individual with a chronic serious health condition or disability. (3) "Respite services coordinator" means a community-based organization or local governmental entity with which the department enters into a contract to facilitate access to respite services under Section 161.154. Sec. 161.152. LIFESPAN RESPITE SERVICES PROGRAM. The department shall implement the lifespan respite services program to promote the provision of respite services through contracts with eligible community-based organizations or local governmental entities. Sec. 161.153. ELIGIBILITY. (a) A person is eligible to participate in the program if the person: (1) is the primary caregiver for a person who: (A) is related to the caregiver within the second degree of consanguinity or affinity; (B) has a chronic serious health condition or disability; (C) requires assistance with one or more activities of daily living; and (D) is not eligible for or not able to participate in any other existing program that provides respite services; and (2) meets criteria specified in rules adopted by the executive commissioner. (b) The executive commissioner may not specify criteria that limit a person's eligibility based on the type of chronic serious health condition or disability of the person receiving care. Sec. 161.154. RESPITE SERVICES CONTRACTS. (a) The department shall contract with at least three eligible community-based organizations or local governmental entities selected by the department to: (1) provide respite services; and (2) facilitate access to respite services. (b) The department may award a contract under this section only after issuing a request for proposals for the contract. (c) A community-based organization or local governmental entity is eligible to contract under this section only if the organization or entity has experience in and an existing procedure for: (1) coordinating support services for multiple groups of persons who need support services, including persons with a physical or intellectual disability and elderly persons; (2) connecting caregivers with respite services providers; (3) maintaining and providing information regarding available respite services; and (4) conducting public awareness activities regarding available respite services. (d) The department shall include in each contract with a respite services coordinator provisions requiring the coordinator to: (1) subject to the availability of money, provide vouchers for respite services to caregivers participating in the program who are not eligible for respite services provided through other programs; and (2) connect caregivers participating in the program with available respite services. (e) The department shall provide each community-based organization or local governmental entity with which the department contracts under this subchapter with: (1) technical assistance; and (2) policy and program development support. (f) The department shall monitor a contractor's performance under a contract entered into under this subchapter using clearly defined and measurable performance objectives. Sec. 161.155. RESPITE SERVICES COORDINATOR FUNCTIONS. A respite services coordinator under contract with the department shall: (1) maintain information regarding respite services providers; (2) build partnerships with respite services providers; and (3) implement public awareness activities regarding respite services. Sec. 161.156. RULES. The executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to implement this subchapter. SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2010, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission, in consultation with the Department of Aging and Disability Services, shall submit a report to the governor and the Legislative Budget Board regarding the lifespan respite services program established under Subchapter F, Chapter 161, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act. The report must include an evaluation of the effect of the program on: (1) access to respite services by primary caregivers of persons with chronic serious health conditions or disabilities; and (2) Medicaid expenditures for long-term care services provided in institutional care settings. SECTION 3. This Act does not make an appropriation. A provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program, creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the provision. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 802 was passed by the House on May 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 802 on May 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 802 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor