Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB805 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Quintanilla, Fletcher, Flynn H.B. No. 805
22 (Senate Sponsor - Carona)
33 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
44 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
55 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 23, 2009, reported
66 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
77 vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
88 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 805 By: Carona
99
1010
1111 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1212 AN ACT
1313 relating to the definitions of police vehicle and authorized
1414 emergency vehicle for the purposes of certain traffic laws.
1515 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1616 SECTION 1. Sections 541.201(1) and (13-a), Transportation
1717 Code, are amended to read as follows:
1818 (1) "Authorized emergency vehicle" means:
1919 (A) a fire department or police vehicle;
2020 (B) a public or private ambulance operated by a
2121 person who has been issued a license by the Texas Department of
2222 Health;
2323 (C) a municipal department or public service
2424 corporation emergency vehicle that has been designated or
2525 authorized by the governing body of a municipality;
2626 (D) a private vehicle of a volunteer firefighter
2727 or a certified emergency medical services employee or volunteer
2828 when responding to a fire alarm or medical emergency;
2929 (E) an industrial emergency response vehicle,
3030 including an industrial ambulance, when responding to an emergency,
3131 but only if the vehicle is operated in compliance with criteria in
3232 effect September 1, 1989, and established by the predecessor of the
3333 Texas Industrial Emergency Services Board of the State Firemen's
3434 and Fire Marshals' Association of Texas; [or]
3535 (F) a vehicle of a blood bank or tissue bank,
3636 accredited or approved under the laws of this state or the United
3737 States, when making emergency deliveries of blood, drugs,
3838 medicines, or organs; or
3939 (G) a vehicle operated by an employee of a
4040 district attorney's office, criminal district attorney's office,
4141 county attorney's office, or medical examiner's office, other than
4242 a vehicle operated in the manner described by Section 546.001(2) or
4343 (4), Section 284.070, Section 366.178, or Section 370.177(a) or
4444 (k), that:
4545 (i) is registered to the appropriate office
4646 and authorized by that office for use in performing the official
4747 duties of the office; or
4848 (ii) is a private vehicle of an employee of
4949 the appropriate office for which the person has received written
5050 authority from that office to use the vehicle in performing
5151 official duties, provided that use of the private vehicle must, if
5252 applicable, comply with any rule adopted by the commissioners court
5353 of a county under Section 170.001, Local Government Code.
5454 (13-a) "Police vehicle" means a vehicle [of a
5555 governmental entity primarily] used by a peace officer, as defined
5656 by Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, for law enforcement
5757 purposes that:
5858 (A) is owned or leased by a governmental entity;
5959 (B) is owned or leased by the police department
6060 of a private institution of higher education that commissions peace
6161 officers under Section 51.212, Education Code; or
6262 (C) is:
6363 (i) a private vehicle owned or leased by the
6464 peace officer; and
6565 (ii) approved for use for law enforcement
6666 purposes by the head of the law enforcement agency that employs the
6767 peace officer, or by that person's designee, provided that use of
6868 the private vehicle must, if applicable, comply with any rule
6969 adopted by the commissioners court of a county under Section
7070 170.001, Local Government Code.
7171 SECTION 2. Section 545.421(b), Transportation Code, is
7272 amended to read as follows:
7373 (b) A signal under this section that is given by a police
7474 officer pursuing a vehicle may be by hand, voice, emergency light,
7575 or siren. The officer giving the signal must be in uniform and
7676 prominently display the officer's badge of office. The officer's
7777 vehicle must bear the insignia of a law enforcement agency,
7878 regardless of whether the vehicle displays an emergency light [be
7979 appropriately marked as an official police vehicle].
8080 SECTION 3. Section 284.070, Transportation Code, is amended
8181 by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
8282 follows:
8383 (e) An authorized emergency vehicle[, as defined by Section
8484 541.201,] is exempt from payment of a toll imposed under this
8585 chapter regardless of whether the vehicle is:
8686 (1) responding to an emergency;
8787 (2) displaying a flashing light; or
8888 (3) marked as an emergency vehicle.
8989 (f) In this section, "authorized emergency vehicle" has the
9090 meaning assigned by Section 541.201.
9191 SECTION 4. Section 366.178, Transportation Code, is amended
9292 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (j) to read as
9393 follows:
9494 (a) A motor vehicle other than an authorized emergency
9595 vehicle[, as defined by Section 541.201,] that passes through a
9696 toll collection facility, whether driven or towed, shall pay the
9797 proper toll. The exemption from payment of a toll for an
9898 authorized emergency vehicle applies regardless of whether the
9999 vehicle is:
100100 (1) responding to an emergency;
101101 (2) displaying a flashing light; or
102102 (3) marked as a police or emergency vehicle.
103103 (j) In this section, "authorized emergency vehicle" has the
104104 meaning assigned by Section 541.201.
105105 SECTION 5. Sections 370.177(a) and (k), Transportation
106106 Code, are amended to read as follows:
107107 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), the operator of
108108 a vehicle, other than an authorized emergency vehicle [as defined
109109 by Section 541.201], that is driven or towed through a toll
110110 collection facility of a turnpike project shall pay the proper
111111 toll. The operator of a vehicle who drives or tows a vehicle
112112 through a toll collection facility and does not pay the proper toll
113113 commits an offense. An offense under this subsection is a
114114 misdemeanor punishable by a fine not to exceed $250. The exemption
115115 from payment of a toll for an authorized emergency vehicle applies
116116 regardless of whether the vehicle is:
117117 (1) responding to an emergency;
118118 (2) displaying a flashing light; or
119119 (3) marked as an emergency vehicle.
120120 (k) In this section:
121121 (1) "Authorized emergency vehicle" has the meaning
122122 assigned by Section 541.201.
123123 (2) "Registered [, "registered] owner" means the owner
124124 of a vehicle as shown on the vehicle registration records of the
125125 department or the analogous department or agency of another state
126126 or country.
127127 SECTION 6. Section 170.001(a), Local Government Code, is
128128 amended to read as follows:
129129 (a) The commissioners court of a county may adopt rules
130130 prohibiting or regulating the use of a privately owned motor
131131 vehicle for the performance of county business or law enforcement
132132 duties by a sheriff or constable or a deputy or employee of a
133133 district attorney, criminal district attorney, county attorney,
134134 medical examiner, sheriff, or constable.
135135 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
136136 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
137137 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
138138 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
139139 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
140140 * * * * *